skip to content

Moe, Gordon Willy

CPSO#: 31783

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5615
Fax: (416) 864-5941 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2300 Yonge Street
Suite 906, PO Box 2439
M4P1E4
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Willy Moe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Moe ( CPSO# 31783 )

Business Address:
906-2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division Of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M1B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5615


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GORDON WILLY MOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1980