THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:33:48 PM
Moe, Gordon Willy
CPSO#:
31783
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5319
Fax: (416) 864-5330
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Willy Moe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:04 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GORDON WILLY MOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1980 |