skip to content

Mitchell, Winston Murray

CPSO#: 21058

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Sep 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1519 Parkwood Dr North Bay ON P1B 4R1
Date Received: 08 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:04 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 2019