THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:01:47 AM
Mitchell, Winston Murray
CPSO#:
21058
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Sep 1967
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1519 Parkwood Dr
North Bay ON P1B 4R1
Date Received: 08 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:04 Dec 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1965 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2019 |