skip to content

Mitchell, Nadine Claudia

CPSO#: 88472

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 830-1771
Fax: (613) 837-3781 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Mitchell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mitchell ( CPSO# 88472 )

Business Address:
210 Centrum Blvd
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone Number: (613) 830-1771

Business Address:
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
210 Centrum Blvd
Orleans ON  K1E 3V7
Phone Number: 613-837-5454

Business Address:
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: 613-737-7600

Business Address:
Huron Perth Healthcare Alliance
Department of Paediatrics
46 General Hospital Drive
Perth ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Algoma Mills ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Div of Academic General Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: 519-685-8500

Business Address:
Jenny Trout Centre
113 - 342 Erie Street
Perth ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 272-2040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADINE CLAUDIA MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 19 Aug 2011 to 18 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012