THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:16:30 AM
Mitchell, Nadine Claudia
CPSO#:
88472
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-210 Centrum Blvd
Orléans ON K1E 3V7
Phone: (613) 830-1771
Fax: (613) 837-3781
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADINE CLAUDIA MITCHELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITCHELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 19 Aug 2011 to 18 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |