skip to content

Benjamin, Milad

CPSO#: 50490

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jan 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Milad, Milad Naguib (used until: 14 May 2020 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Spanish

Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7131 Bathurst St, Suite 204
Thornhill ON  L3J 7Z1
Phone: 905-597-7595 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MILAD BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1983

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Benjamin’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Benjamin failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients and/or engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in that he inappropriately submitted claims and/or billing to the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, SunLife Financial and the Ministry of Children, Community and Social Services, for creating false or inaccurate records and that he failed to cooperate with College investigators by failing to disclose information pertaining to financial arrangements with a third party provider. It is also alleged that Dr. Benjamin is incompetent.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Motion: May 25-26 & Jun 24, 2022

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 11, 2019, Dr. Milad has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)