THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:36:08 AM
Benjamin, Milad
CPSO#:
50490
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Oct 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jan 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Milad, Milad Naguib (used until: 14 May 2020 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Spanish
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - Florida
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: September 22, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Milad Benjamin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 22, 2022:
Dr. Benjamin was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence. After the referral but before the hearing, Dr. Benjamin resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective November 11, 2019, Dr. Milad has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)