skip to content

Mercer, Christopher Michael

CPSO#: 85759

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Colonel By Dr
CF H Svcs Gp HQ
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-992-4581 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

CGMH
459 Hume St
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W8
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher Mercer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mercer ( CPSO# 85759 )

Business Address:
217 Royal Ave
Ottawa ON  K2A 1T8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:15 Oct 2018 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective:17 Nov 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2006