THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:53:07 PM
Mercer, Christopher Michael
CPSO#:
85759
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101 Colonel By Dr
CF H Svcs Gp HQ
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: 613-992-4581
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Deep River and District Hospital |
Deep River |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
West Nipissing General Hospital |
Sturgeon Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:15 Oct 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MERCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2006 |