skip to content

Mendoza, Maribel Bacani

CPSO#: 90455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maribel Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mendoza ( CPSO# 90455 )

Business Address:
Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7H5
Phone Number: (905) 875-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIBEL BACANI MENDOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDOZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 26 Sep 2010 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2011