THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:44:06 AM
Mendoza, Maribel Bacani
CPSO#:
90455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton ON L9T 7H5
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIBEL BACANI MENDOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDOZA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Sep 2010 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2011 |