skip to content

Memon, Sadaf Shaukat

CPSO#: 100510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SADAF SHAUKAT MEMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEMON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2019