THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:26:05 AM
Memon, Sadaf Shaukat
CPSO#:
100510
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SADAF SHAUKAT MEMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEMON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - General Pathology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2019 |