skip to content

Mehta, Chaula Ashish

CPSO#: 96646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215-4025 Yonge St
TRIO Fertility- North York
North York ON  M2P 2E3
Phone: 416.506.0804 Ext. ext. 3286
Fax: 416-599-5647 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chaula Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mehta ( CPSO# 96646 )

Business Address:
Anova Fertility
650 - 25 Sheppard Avenue
Toronto ON  M2N 6S6
Phone Number: (416) 225-4440

Business Address:
205-4025 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone Number: 416.506.0804


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHAULA ASHISH MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016