THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:56:01 PM
Mehta, Chaula Ashish
CPSO#:
96646
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu
Education: University of Pune, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
655 Bay St
TRIO Fertility
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
Phone: 4165060804 Ext. 3286
Fax: 4162994526
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHAULA ASHISH MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2016 |