skip to content

Mednick, Zale David

CPSO#: 97721

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarity Eye
1849 Yonge Street Suite 705
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: 416-481-4433
Fax: 416-481-7011 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zale Mednick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Mednick ( CPSO# 97721 )

Business Address:
1849 Yonge Street
Suite 705
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 481-4433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZALE DAVID MEDNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDNICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018