THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 22:09:56 PM
Mednick, Zale David
CPSO#:
97721
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clarity Eye
1849 Yonge Street Suite 705
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: 416-481-4433
Fax: 416-481-7011
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZALE DAVID MEDNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEDNICK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2018 |