skip to content

McKinney, Katherine Anne

CPSO#: 30810

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 821 Dufferin Ave London, ON N5W 3J9
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 01 Feb 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2018