THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 13:47:50 PM
McKinney, Katherine Anne
CPSO#:
30810
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jun 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
821 Dufferin Ave
London, ON N5W 3J9
Date Received: 01 Feb 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2018 |