skip to content

McAlister, Chryssa Nuala Gabriella

CPSO#: 87265

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 410
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 579-7000
Fax: (888) 465-6912 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chryssa McAlister Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McAlister ( CPSO# 87265 )

Business Address:
Belmont Professional Centre
306 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 579-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRYSSA NUALA GABRIELLA MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013