THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:50:42 PM
McAlister, Chryssa Nuala Gabriella
CPSO#:
87265
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Belmont Professional Centre
Suite 411
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 579-7000
Fax: (888) 465-6912
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRYSSA NUALA GABRIELLA MCALISTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCALISTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |