skip to content

Mauro, Marina

CPSO#: 85727

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Suite 153
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-7117
Fax: (519) 938-5642 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Mauro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mauro ( CPSO# 85727 )

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Headwaters Orangeville
Department of Internal Medicine
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
153 - 150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-7117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARINA MAURO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAURO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 12 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 13 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2009