THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:29:25 PM
Mauro, Marina
CPSO#:
85727
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Suite 153
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-7117
Fax: (519) 938-5642
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Headwaters Health Care Centre |
Orangeville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARINA MAURO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAURO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2006 to 12 Jan 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 13 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2009 |