skip to content

Matveyev, Aliaksandr

CPSO#: 87222

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Minsk State Medical Institute, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aliaksandr Matveyev Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matveyev ( CPSO# 87222 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALIAKSANDR MATVEYEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATVEYEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2014

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: March 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Aliaksandr Matveyev was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Care or control of a motor vehicle while impaired, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: January 9, 2018
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1500; Victim Surcharge of $450.