THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:32:37 AM
Matveyev, Aliaksandr
CPSO#:
87222
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Mar 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Minsk State Medical Institute, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALIAKSANDR MATVEYEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATVEYEV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 21 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: March 12, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Aliaksandr Matveyev was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Care or control of a motor vehicle while impaired, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: January 9, 2018
SENTENCE: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $1500; Victim Surcharge of $450.