skip to content

Matthew, Elizabeth

CPSO#: 31893

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Aug 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
46 Golden Ave
Lexington MA  02421
United States
Phone: 617-794-1222

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MATTHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1980