THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:37:32 PM
Matthew, Elizabeth
CPSO#:
31893
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Aug 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Madras, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
46 Golden Ave
Lexington MA 02421
United States
Phone: 617-794-1222
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New York
USA - Virginia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MATTHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTHEW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1980 |