skip to content

Masselink, William Stephen

CPSO#: 87381

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
AVP - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010