THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:02:19 PM
Masselink, William Stephen
CPSO#:
87381
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Aug 2007
AVP - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |