skip to content

Marshall, Bruce Roger

CPSO#: 30993

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Feb 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Feb 2009

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: January 22, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Bruce Roger Marshall undertakes to resign effective February 15, 2009, and not to re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.