THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:58:35 AM
Marshall, Bruce Roger
CPSO#:
30993
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
15 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Executive Committee
Active Date: January 22, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Bruce Roger Marshall undertakes to resign effective February 15, 2009, and not to re-apply for registration as a physician or for a license to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.