skip to content

Markovic, Ruth Edith

CPSO#: 22128

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Melbourne, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 5, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Markovic has resigned from the College effective June 7, 2019.


Source: Member
Active Date: February 5, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ruth Edith Markovic to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 5, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Markovic engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her cosmetic medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Markovic will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Markovic’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately three (3) months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.