THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:42:27 PM
Markovic, Ruth Edith
CPSO#:
22128
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Feb 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1969 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: June 5, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Markovic has resigned from the College effective June 7, 2019.