skip to content

Marcotte, Mary Emily Rose

CPSO#: 95394

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Paediatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Suite 204
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0C2
Canada
Phone: 519-735-7715
Fax: 519-962-5974
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emily Marcotte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Marcotte ( CPSO# 95394 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Peadiatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Suite 204
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0C2
Phone Number: (519) 735-7715

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY EMILY ROSE MARCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOTTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2016 to 27 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016