THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:09:23 PM
Marcotte, Mary Emily Rose
CPSO#:
95394
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Department of Paediatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:17 Dec 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY EMILY ROSE MARCOTTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCOTTE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2016 to 27 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |