skip to content

Manokaran, Kamini

CPSO#: 87787

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (647) 347-2401
Fax: (647) 347-2801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kamini Manokaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Manokaran ( CPSO# 87787 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (647) 347-2401

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective:05 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 10 Oct 2007 to 07 Nov 2007
PEAP - R - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 08 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 17 Feb 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 Apr 2021 Active
 (1 of 1) 
As from March 29, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kamini Manokaran in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Manokaran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. KAMINI MANOKARAN  
("Dr. Manokaran")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
 
"IEP" means Individualized Education Plan; and

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Manokaran, certificate of registration number 87787, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1114148 (the "Investigation") into my care of a patient in my rheumatology practice. 

(4)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Manokaran, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Manokaran, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Individualized instruction in medical ethics and professionalism satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the College;

(ii)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:      
      
	Medical Records Documentation College policy; and

(iii)	Medical Record-Keeping Course, University of Toronto: www.cpd.utoronto.ca/recordkeeping/.

(b)	I, Dr. Manokaran, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Manokaran, undertake to complete this requirement within six (6) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(d)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.

(7)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Manokaran, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Manokaran, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(10)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(11)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(13)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(14)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Manokaran's care of a patient in her rheumatology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Manokaran will engage in professional education in medical ethics and professionalism and medical record keeping.

(c)	I, Dr. Manokaran, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.

D.	CONSENT

(15)	I, Dr. Manokaran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16)	I, Dr. Manokaran, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Manokaran, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


(2 of 2)
Dr.  Kamini Manokaran may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology in an office setting, only.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 29, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kamini Manokaran to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 29, 2021:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Manokaran’s care of a patient in her rheumatology practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Manokaran will engage in professional education in medical ethics and professionalism and medical record keeping.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)