skip to content

Manokaran, Kamini

CPSO#: 87787

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Mar 2010
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (647) 347-2401
Fax: (647) 347-2801 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kamini Manokaran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Manokaran ( CPSO# 87787 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (647) 347-2401


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 10 Oct 2007 to 07 Nov 2007
PEAP - Resident - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 08 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 16 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 17 Feb 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2011 Active
             Dr.  Kamini Manokaran may practise medicine independently in Rheumatology in an
            office setting, only.