skip to content

Mann, Matthew Adam

CPSO#: 94815

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 May 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3925 Sheridan Dr
Amherst NY  14226
United States
Phone: 7162254891

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ADAM MANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2014