THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:15:44 AM
Mann, Matthew Adam
CPSO#:
94815
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2011 to 13 Mar 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |