skip to content

Mangel, Ryan Sean

CPSO#: 91939

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mangel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2013
Corporation Name: Ryan Mangel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical record requests should be emailed to [email protected]
Date Received: 09 Jan 2019


Instructions: Patients can send medical record requests to [email protected]
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Alabama
USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2016