THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 17:16:50 PM
Mangel, Ryan Sean
CPSO#:
91939
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mangel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 15 2013
Corporation Name: Ryan Mangel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 18 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Alabama
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2016 |