skip to content

Maleki, Babak

CPSO#: 88060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1033 Bay St, suite 309
Toronto ON  M5S3A5
Phone: (416) 962-5005
Fax: (416) 962-5856 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Maleki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BABAK MALEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 20 Jan 2008 to 01 Feb 2008
EL - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 02 Feb 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013