THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:30:40 AM
Maleki, Babak
CPSO#:
88060
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1033 Bay St, suite 309
Toronto ON M5S3A5
Phone: (416) 962-5005
Fax: (416) 962-5856
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. B. Maleki Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BABAK MALEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALEKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 20 Jan 2008 to 01 Feb 2008
EL - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 02 Feb 2008 to 15 Feb 2008
EL - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2013 |