skip to content

Mailer, Colin Mcgregor

CPSO#: 22258

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Spanish

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record should contact the office they attended: Hakim London King County of Middlesex 217 King St London ON N6A 1C9 Tel: 519-439-0277 Fax: 519-439-0279 or Secondary Peaker Optical County of Middlesex 1984 Dundas St E London ON N5V 1P5 Tel: 519-451-5417 Fax: 519-451-0644
Date Received: 16 Sep 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 2019