THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:39:18 PM
Mailer, Colin Mcgregor
CPSO#:
22258
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
27 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jul 1969
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German, Spanish
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Paitents seeking a copy of their medical record should contact the office they attended:
Hakim London King County of Middlesex
217 King St
London ON N6A 1C9
Tel: 519-439-0277
Fax: 519-439-0279
or
Secondary Peaker Optical County of Middlesex
1984 Dundas St E
London ON N5V 1P5
Tel: 519-451-5417
Fax: 519-451-0644
Date Received: 16 Sep 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2019 |