Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 5, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Ali Mahmoudi was charged with the following offences:
1. Seven counts of Sexual Assault, between January 1, 2015 and December 31, 2021, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.
2. Assault, between January 1, 2018 and December 31, 2018, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.
3. Two counts of Forcible Confinement, between January 1, 2018 and October 20, 2020, contrary to Section 279(2) of the Criminal Code.
4. Assault with a weapon, between January 1, 2019 and December 31, 2019, contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: November 15, 2022
Place of Charge: Timmins, Ontario
Timmins Police Services
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 30, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On July 30, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Ali Mahmoudi:
1. Mahmoudi must remain in his residence except for medical emergencies involving him or immediate family; for purposes of travelling directly to, from and while at court appearances, or meeting with his lawyer, or for purposes of complying with this or any other court Order; for purposes of travelling directly to, from and while at work; and when he is in the presence of his named surety.
2. Mahmoudi must not contact or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with a named person or members of their immediate family.
3. Mahmoudi must not be within 200 metres of any place where he knows named person or members of their immediate family to live, work, go to school, frequent or any place he knows the persons to be EXCEPT for required court appearances.
4. Mahmoudi must not attend at named address.
5. Mahmoudi must not possess any weapons as defined by the Criminal Code or any imitation.
6. Mahmoudi must not apply for authorization, licence or registration certificate for any weapon as defined by the Criminal Code.
7. Mahmoudi must surrender any passports in his name to the Timmins Police Services within 48 hrs.
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 30, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Ali Mahmoudi was charged with the following offences:
1. Two counts of Extortion, on or about January 1, 2022, contrary to Section 346(1.1)(b) of the Criminal Code.
2. Two counts of Sexual Assault, on or about January 1, 2022 and July 1, 2022, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.
3. Two counts of Sexual Assault - Choking, Suffocate or Strangle, on or about January 1, 2022 and July 1, 2022, contrary to Section 272(1)(c.1) of the Criminal Code.
4. Distribution of Intimate Images and Videos Without Consent, on or about July 22, 2022, contrary to Section 162.1(1) of the Criminal Code.
5. Two counts of Assault, on or about July 1, 2022 and July 15, 2022, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.
6. Forcible Confinement, on or about July 15, 2022, contrary to Section 279(2) of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: July 30, 2022
Place of Charge: Timmins, Ontario
Timmins Police Services