Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 5, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Ali Mahmoudi was charged with the following offences:
1. Seven counts of Sexual Assault, between January 1, 2015 and December 31, 2021, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.
2. Assault, between January 1, 2018 and December 31, 2018, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.
3. Two counts of Forcible Confinement, between January 1, 2018 and October 20, 2020, contrary to Section 279(2) of the Criminal Code.
4. Assault with a weapon, between January 1, 2019 and December 31, 2019, contrary to Section 267(a) of the Criminal Code.
Date of Charge: November 15, 2022
Place of Charge: Timmins, Ontario
Timmins Police Services