skip to content

Trozzi, Mark Raymond

CPSO#: 62778

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 Jan 2024
EXPIRY DATE
25 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Oct 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jason P. Heavens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2022
Corporation Name: Trozzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 28 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee Effective: 08 Dec 2022
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 25 Jan 2024

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 06 Oct 2023
Summary:

On October 6, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Trozzi committed professional misconduct by:
  • engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19 in social media postings, on his website and in interviews;
  • failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients to whom he issued medical exemptions from COVID-19 vaccines; and
  • failing to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College.
The Tribunal also found Dr. Trozzi incompetent.

A penalty hearing was held on November 10, 2023, after which the Tribunal reserved its decision on penalty. 
 

The panel’s reasons for decision on penalty were released on January 24, 2024. The Tribunal ordered that: 

  • The Registrar revoke Dr. Trozzi’s certificate of registration effective 12:01 a.m. on January 25, 2024.  
  • Dr. Trozzi appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
  • Dr. Trozzi pay the College costs of $94,960 by February 23, 2024. 

More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.caandhttps://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected]. 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Case Management: 2022-10-21; Motions: 2022-09-07; 2022-11-23; 2023-03-10; Merits: 2023-06-13 to 16; 2023-06-19; 2023-07-11 to 12; 2023-07-17; Penalty: 2023-11-10