THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:42:46 AM
Trozzi, Mark Raymond
CPSO#:
62778
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
25 Jan 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Oct 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jason P. Heavens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2022
Corporation Name: Trozzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 28 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1991 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 1991 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Mar 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2021 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Dec 2022 |
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal |
Effective: 25 Jan 2024 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 06 Oct 2023
Summary:
On October 6, 2023, the Tribunal found that Dr. Trozzi committed professional misconduct by:- engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19 in social media postings, on his website and in interviews;
- failing to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients to whom he issued medical exemptions from COVID-19 vaccines; and
- failing to respond appropriately or within a reasonable time to a written inquiry from the College.
The Tribunal also found Dr. Trozzi incompetent.
A penalty hearing was held on November 10, 2023, after which the Tribunal reserved its decision on penalty.
The panel’s reasons for decision on penalty were released on January 24, 2024. The Tribunal ordered that:
- The Registrar revoke Dr. Trozzi’s certificate of registration effective 12:01 a.m. on January 25, 2024.
- Dr. Trozzi appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Trozzi pay the College costs of $94,960 by February 23, 2024.
On February 23, 2024, Dr. Trozzi served a Notice of Appeal to the Divisional Court from the Tribunal’s decisions on finding, penalty and two related motions. The Notice of Appeal does not stay the Tribunal’s penalty order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Case Management: 2022-10-21; Motions: 2022-09-07; 2022-11-23; 2023-03-10; Merits: 2023-06-13 to 16; 2023-06-19; 2023-07-11 to 12; 2023-07-17; Penalty: 2023-11-10